Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 06-671
No. 06-671
Title:
St. Luke's Subacute Hospital and Nursing Centre, Inc., and Guy Seaton, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:November 15, 2006
Linked with 06A340
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(04-10231)
  Decision Date:May 5, 2006
  Rehearing Denied:July 14, 2006

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 29 2006 Application (06A340) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 12, 2006 to November 13, 2006, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Oct 4 2006 Application (06A340) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 13, 2006.
Nov 13 2006 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2006)
Nov 21 2006 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Nov 29 2006 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 5, 2007.
Jan 8 2007 Petition DENIED.
Jan 20 2007 Application (06A724) to extend the time to file a petition for rehearing from February 2, 2007 to March 4, 2007, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jan 24 2007 Application (06A724) denied by Justice Kennedy.
Feb 2 2007 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Feb 7 2007 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 23, 2007.
Feb 26 2007 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
William Mallory Kent 1932 Perry Place(904) 398-8000
Jacksonville, FL  32207-3443
kent@williamkent.com
Party name: Guy Seaton
 
Guy R. Seaton 6701 Peycos Drive(510) 813-7332
Placerville, CA  95667
Party name: St. Luke's Subacute Hospital and Nursing Centre, Inc., et al. Applicants
Attorneys for Respondent:
Paul D. Clement Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543