SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24A866
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24A866
Title:
Monsanto Company, Applicant
v.
Larry Johnson, et al.
Docketed:
March 11, 2025
Linked with 24-1098
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Oregon
Case Numbers:
(A179665)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2025
Application (24A866) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 19, 2025 to April 18, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Other
Proof of Service
Mar 11 2025
Application (24A866) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 18, 2025.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Tauber
Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
1155 F St NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20008
andrew.tauber@bclplaw.com
202-508-6111
Party name: Monsanto Company
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##