Docket for 24A1007
|
Apr 18 2025 | Application (24A1007) for injunction, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther | Apr 18 2025 | Application (24A1007) referred to the Court. | | | Apr 19 2025 | There is before the Court an application on behalf of a putative class of detainees seeking an injunction against their removal under the Alien Enemies Act. The matter is currently pending before the Fifth Circuit. Upon action by the Fifth Circuit, the Solicitor General is invited to file a response to the application before this Court as soon as possible. The Government is directed not to remove any member of the putative class of detainees from the United States until further order of this Court. See 28 U. S. C. §1651(a). Justice Thomas and Justice Alito dissent from the Court’s order. Statement from Justice Alito to follow. | | | Apr 19 2025 | Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas joins, dissenting. (Detached Opinion) | | | Apr 19 2025 | Response to application from respondents Donald J. Trump, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Apr 21 2025 | Reply of applicants A.A.R.P., et al. filed. | | ReplyReplyProof of Service | Apr 23 2025 | Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix Under Seal filed by applicant A.A.R.P., et al. | | Main Document | May 11 2025 | Letter from applicants A.A.R.P., et al. notifying the Court of the District Court decision filed. | | Main DocumentOther | May 12 2025 | Supplemental brief of respondents Donald J. Trump, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 14 2025 | Supplemental brief of applicants A.A.R.P., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 16 2025 | Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix Under Seal GRANTED. | | | May 16 2025 | The application for an injunction pending further proceedings is granted. Additionally, applicants suggested this Court treat the application as a petition for a writ of certiorari; doing so, the petition is granted (case No. 24-1177). The judgment of the Fifth Circuit is vacated, and the case is remanded to the Fifth Circuit. In resolving the detainees’ appeal, the Fifth Circuit should address (1) all the normal preliminary injunction factors, including likelihood of success on the merits, as to the named plaintiffs’ underlying habeas claims that the AEA does not authorize their removal pursuant to the President’s March 14, 2025, Proclamation, and (2) the issue of what notice is due, as to the putative class’s due process claims against summary removal. The Government is enjoined from removing the named plaintiffs or putative class members in this action under the AEA pending order by the Fifth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.
Justice Kavanaugh, concurring (detached opinion).
Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas joins, dissenting (detached opinion). (Detached Opinion) | | |
|