Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-889
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-889
Title:Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 19, 2025
Linked with 24A652
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2023-1169)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:October 17, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2024Application (24A652) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2025 to February 14, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2025Application (24A652) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 14, 2025.
Feb 14 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 21, 2025)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2025 to April 21, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 21, 2025.
Mar 20 2025Brief amici curiae of 30 Scholars of Law, Economics, and Medicine filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2025Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2025 to May 15, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Bennett Klein
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1901 L Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

cklein@winston.com
(202) 282-5000
Party name: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. and Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Robert Huston
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
2525 E. Camelback Road
Suite 500
Phoenix, AZ 85016

mhuston@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1630
Party name: Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al.
Other
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
American University Washington College of Law
4300 Nebraska Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20016

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
(202) 274-4124
Party name: 30 Scholars of Law, Economics, and Medicine
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MHELLMAN@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543