Oct 11 2024 | Application (24A361) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2024 to December 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions |
Oct 17 2024 | Application (24A361) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 4, 2024. |
| |
Dec 04 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2025) |
| PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 17 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Montana to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Dec 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. |
| |
Jan 02 2025 | Response Requested. (Due February 3, 2025) |
| |
Jan 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2025 to March 5, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 06 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2025. |
| |
Feb 03 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Feb 12 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2025 to April 4, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 14 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 4, 2025. |
| |
Apr 02 2025 | Brief of respondent Montana in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Apr 15 2025 | Reply of petitioner William Trevor Case filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Apr 16 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. |
| |
May 01 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |