Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-556
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-556
Title:Joe Fernandez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 18, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3122)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:August 15, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2024Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025.
Dec 09 2024Response Requested. (Due January 8, 2025)
Jan 03 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2025 to February 7, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 07 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2025
Feb 07 2025Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2025Reply of petitioner Joe Fernandez filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025.
May 19 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Gruenstein
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
Two Manhattan West
375 Ninth Avenue
New York, NY 10001

bgruenstein@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: Joe Fernandez
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543