Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-1046
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-1046
Title:Jason Wolford, et al., Petitioners
v.
Anne E. Lopez, Attorney General of Hawaii
Docketed:April 3, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-16164)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:January 15, 2025
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 01 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 5, 2025 to June 4, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2025.
May 01 2025Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 01 2025Amicus brief of The National Association For Gun Rights submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2025Amicus brief of Second Amendment Law Center, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, Delaware State Sportsmen’s Association, Inc., Hawaii Rifle Association, Gun Owners of California, Second Amendment Defense and Education Coalition, Ltd., Federal Firearms Licensees of Illinois, Minnesota Gun Owners Caucus, Operation Blazing Sword–Pink Pistols submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Alexander Beck
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Alan Beck
2692 Harcourt Drive
San Diego, CA 92123

ALAN.ALEXANDER.BECK@GMAIL.COM
6199059105
Party name: Jason Wolford, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Milbank LLP
1850 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

nkatyal@milbank.com
202-835-7505
Party name: Anne Lopez
Other
Barry Kevin Arrington
    Counsel of Record
Arrington Law Firm
4195 Wadsworth Boulevard
Wheat Ridge, CO 80033

BARRY@ARRINGTONPC.COM
3032057870
Party name: The National Association For Gun Rights
C. D. Michel
    Counsel of Record
Michel & Associates, P.C.
180 East Ocean Blvd.
Suite 200
Long Beach, CA 90802

CMICHEL@MICHELLAWYERS.COM
(562) 216-4444
Party name: Second Amendment Law Center, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, Delaware State Sportsmen’s Association, Inc., Hawaii Rifle Association, Gun Owners of California, Second Amendment Defense and Education Coalition, Ltd., Federal Firearms Licensees of Illinois, Minnesota Gun Owners Caucus, Operation Blazing Sword–Pink Pistols
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543