Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-5856
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-5856
Title:Dmt MacTruong, aka Mac Truong, Petitioner
v.
Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Docketed:October 23, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-51024)
   Decision Date:August 1, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 22, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 22 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 08 2024Because the Court lacks a quorum, 28 U. S. C. §1, and since the qualified Justices are of the opinion that the case cannot be heard and determined at the next Term of the Court, the judgment is affirmed under 28 U. S. C. §2109, which provides that under these circumstances "the court shall enter its order affirming the judgment of the court from which the case was brought for review with the same effect as upon affirmance by an equally divided court." The Chief Justice, Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, Justice Gorsuch, Justice Kavanaugh, and Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
DMT MacTruong875 Bergen Ave.
Jersey City, NJ 07306

(914) 215-2304
Party name: DMT MacTruong
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543