Docket for 22A652
 | | No. 22A652
| Title: | Ohio, Applicant v. Janet L. Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al. | Docketed: | January 20, 2023 | Linked with 22-880 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (21-3787) | Decision Date: | | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Jan 18 2023 | Application (22A652) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 16, 2023 to April 17, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 20 2023 | Application (22A652) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 17, 2023. | | |
|