SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-957
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-957
Title:
Laurie A. Dermody, Petitioner
v.
Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Docketed:
March 31, 2023
Lower Ct:
Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Case Numbers:
(SJC-13199)
Decision Date:
January 27, 2023
Rule 12.4
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2023)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 27 2023
Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Chapter of the National Academy of Elder Law Attorneys filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 01 2023
Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services to respond filed.
Main Document
May 09 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023.
May 11 2023
Response Requested. (Due June 12, 2023)
May 17 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2023 to July 12, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2023.
Jul 12 2023
Brief of respondent Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 26 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jul 26 2023
Reply of petitioners Laurie A. Dermody, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 02 2023
The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 09 2024
Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001
AUNIKOWSKY@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Laurie A. Dermody, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Katherine Brady Dirks
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Massachusetts
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108
KATHERINE.DIRKS@MASS.GOV
617-963-2277
Party name: Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Patricia Frances Keane Martin
Counsel of Record
Seegel Lipshutz Lo & Martin, LLP
80 William Street, Suite 200
Wellesley, MA 02481
pkmartin@sllm-law.com
781-591-4147
Party name: Massachusetts Chapter of the National Academy of Elder Law Attorneys
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##