Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-352
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-352
Title:Jason Gonzales, Petitioner
v.
Michael J. Madigan, et al.
Docketed:September 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1874)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Friends of Michael J. Madigan and 13th Ward Democratic Organization to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Shaw Decremer to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Michael J. Madigan to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Silvana Tabares to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021Waiver of right of respondent Joe Barboza to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 24 2021Waiver of right of respondent Grasiela Rodriguez to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony Joseph Peraica
    Counsel of Record
Anthony J. Peraica & Associates, Ltd
5130 South Archer Avenue
Chicago, IL 60632

support@peraica.com
(773) 735-1700
Party name: Jason Gonzales
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael J. Kasper
    Counsel of Record
Kasper & Nottage, P.C.
151 North Franklin Street
Suite 2500
Chicago, IL 60606

mjkasper60@mac.com
3127043297
Party name: Friends of Michael J. Madigan and 13th Ward Democratic Organization
Michael Allen Kreloff
    Counsel of Record
Michael Kreloff, Attorney at Law
3710 Commercial Ave.
Ste. 5
Northbrook, IL 60062

capitolaction@yahoo.com
8475251139
Party name: Shaw Decremer
Richard J. Prendergast
    Counsel of Record
Richard J. Prendergast, LTD.
111 W. Washington Street
Suite 1100
Chicago, IL 60602

rprendergast@rjpltd.com
3126410881
Party name: Silvana Tabares
Adam Robert Vaught
    Counsel of Record
Hinshaw & Culbertson
222 N. LaSalle St #300
Chicago, IL 60601

avaught@hinshawlaw.com
2177201961
Party name: Michael J. Madigan
Christopher Brennan Wilson
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
131 South Dearborn Street, Suite 1700
Chicago, IL 60603

cwilson@perkinscoie.com
3123248400
Party name: Joe Barboza
Scott B. ErdmanThe Law Offices of Scott B. Erdman, P.C.
8 S. Michigan Avenue, Ste. 811
Chicago, IL 60603

ScottErdman@ErdmanLawOffices.com
773-220-9961
Party name: Grasiela Rodriguez

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543