Docket for 21-1172
 | | No. 21-1172
| Title: | American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California | Docketed: | February 24, 2022 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (20-55734) | Decision Date: | October 6, 2021 | Rehearing Denied: | November 23, 2021 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Feb 22 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 04 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al. | | Blanket Consent | Mar 10 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022. | | | Mar 23 2022 | Response Requested. (Due April 22, 2022) | | | Mar 28 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2022 to May 23, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 07 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2022. | | | Apr 12 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Fight for Freelancers, et al filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Independent Institute, et al. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 23 2022 | Brief of respondent Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 03 2022 | Reply of petitioners American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al. filed.(Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 07 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022. | | | Jun 27 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|