SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-995
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-995
Title:
Crunch San Diego, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Jordan Marks
Docketed:
January 30, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(14-56834)
Decision Date:
September 20, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
October 30, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 13 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 15 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2019.
Feb 21 2019
Agreement to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 26 2019
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pratik Arvind Shah
Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109
pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Crunch San Diego, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Counsel of Record
Kazerouni Law Group APC
245 Fischer Ave., Suite D-1
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
ak@kazlg.com
800-400-6808
Party name: Jordan Marks
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##