Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-398
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-398
Title:FCA US LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Brian Flynn, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-8010)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2018
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:June 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2018 to November 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 28, 2018.
Oct 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers and American Tort Reform Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Amicus brief of CTIA–THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION, et al. not accepted for filing. (October 31, 2018) (Corrected version to be submitted)
Oct 29 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by CTIA–THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 28 2018Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondents.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 28 2018Brief of respondents in opposition filed.
Dec 11 2018Reply of petitioners FCA US LLC and Harman International Industries, Incorporated filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by CTIA–THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION, et al. GRANTED.
Jan 07 2019Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: FCA US LLC and Harman International Industries, Incorporated
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffery Thomas McPherson
    Counsel of Record
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
7700 Forsyth Boulevard
Suite 1800
St. Louis, MO 63105

jmcpherson@armstrongteasdale.com
314-621-5070
Party name: Brian Flynn, et al.
Other
Megan L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

mbrown@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: CTIA–THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION, CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE, AND ASSOCIATION FOR UNMANNED VEHICLE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1155 F Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers and American Tort Reform Association
Erika Ziebarth Jones
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ejones@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543