Jul 28 2016 | Application (16A115) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2016 to October 28, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| |
Aug 03 2016 | Application (16A115) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 28, 2016. |
| |
Oct 27 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 2, 2016) |
| |
Nov 23 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2017. |
| |
Dec 15 2016 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 3, 2017. |
| |
Feb 02 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 6, 2017. |
| |
Mar 06 2017 | Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent. |
| |
Mar 06 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| |
Mar 15 2017 | Reply of petitioner Eric Jordan filed. |
| |
Mar 22 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017. |
| |
Apr 17 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017. |
| |
Apr 24 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. |
| |
May 08 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017. |
| |
May 15 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017. |
| |
May 22 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017. |
| |
May 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017. |
| |
Jun 27 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018. |
| |
Jun 28 2018 | Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED. |
| |
Jun 28 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
| |
Jul 20 2018 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Aug 02 2018 | DISTRIBUTED. |
| |
Aug 24 2018 | Rehearing DENIED. |
| |