Docket for 16-388
|
Sep 22 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2016) | | | Oct 20 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 28, 2016. | | | Nov 23 2016 | Brief of respondent Raymours Furniture Company, Inc. in opposition filed. | | | Dec 07 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. | | | Jan 09 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017. | | | Apr 30 2018 | Stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 filed. | | Main Document | May 09 2018 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. | | |
|