Docket for 16-1461
|
Mar 06 2017 | Application (16A879) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 3, 2017 to June 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Mar 13 2017 | Application (16A879) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 2, 2017. | | | Jun 02 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 7, 2017) | | | Jun 09 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 7, 2017. | | | Jun 20 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for respondents. | | | Jun 20 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners. | | | Jul 05 2017 | Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars filed. | | | Jul 07 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Professors of Legal History Barbara Aronstein Black, et al. filed. | | | Aug 07 2017 | Brief of respondents Kellogg Brown & Root, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Aug 21 2017 | Reply of petitioners Ramchandra Adhikari, et al. filed. Distributed | | | Aug 23 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|