Docket for 22A1078
 | | No. 22A1078
| Title: | Marlon Abraham Rosasen, Applicant v. Thea Marie Rosasen | Docketed: | June 14, 2023 | Linked with 23-5425 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (20-55459) | Decision Date: | | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Jun 08 2023 | Application (22A1078) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 19, 2023 to August 18, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Proof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsMain Document | Jun 14 2023 | Application (22A1078) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 18, 2023. | | |
|