SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
500+ items found for your search:
executive power
Page: 1 of 72
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
QuestionsReport
Oversight Board ("PCAOB") with far-reaching
executive
power
while completely stripping the President of all
19-422 Collins v. Yellen (06/23/2021)
grounds—that theFHFA’s structure violates the separation of
powers
because the Agency is led by a action to restrain or affect the exercise of
powers
or functions of the Agency as a conservator or a
21-1052 United States ex rel. Polansky v. Executive Health Resources, Inc. (06/16/2023)
tam action alleging that respondent
Executive
Health Resources helped hospitals overbill Medicare of Appeals held that the Government has that
power
so long as it intervened sometime later. And the
19-7 Seila Law LLC v. Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (06/29/2020)
neglect, or malfeasance violates the separation of
powers
.Pp. 11–30. (a) Article II vests the entire “
executive
Power
” in President alone, but the Constitution presumes that lesser
executive
officers
18-1334 Financial Oversight and Management Bd. for Puerto Rico v. Aurelius Investment, LLC (06/01/2020)
creates local offices using these two unique
powers
, the officers exercise
power
of the local government, not the Federal
22-592-2.pdf
The Vaccine Without Financial Barriers •
Executive
Order 2020-59 Further Mitigation Requirement for Events •
Executive
Order 2020-60 Easing Regulations to Encourage
590us1r30_3f14.pdf
PRELIMINARY PRINT Volume 590 U. S. Part 1 Pages 255–295 OFFICIAL REPORTS OF THE SUPREME COURT April 27, 2020 Page Proof Pending Publication NOTICE: This preliminary print is subject to formal
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##