SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
8 items found. Page: 1 of 2 for your search: "Robert F. Kennedy Jr."
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
Day Call, Monday, April 21, 2025
of Justice Washington, D. C. No. 24-316. (1)
ROBERT
F
.
KENNEDY
,
JR
., SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ET AL
23-411 Murthy v. Missouri (12/11/2023)
of the alleged victims of this campaign is
Robert
F
.
Kennedy
,
Jr
., who is a candidate for President of the United
hearinglist-april2025.pdf
HEARING LIST Monday, April 21, 2025 No. 24–316.
Robert
F
.
Kennedy
,
Jr
., Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. v
Order List (12/11/2023)
(ORDER LIST: 601 U.S.) MONDAY, DECEMBER 11, 2023 CERTIORARI --SUMMARY DISPOSITIONS 22-1225 PAYNE, JASON V. BIDEN, PRESIDENT OF U.S., ET AL. The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. The
23-715 Advocate Christ Medical Center v. Kennedy (04/29/2025)
(Slip Opinion) OCTOBER TERM, 2024 1 Syllabus NOTE: Where it is feasible, a syllabus (headnote) will be released, as is being done in connection with this case, at the time the opinion is issued. The
603us1r49_n6io.pdf
PRELIMINARY PRINT Volume 603 U. S. Part 1 Pages 43–108 OFFICIAL REPORTS OF THE SUPREME COURT June 26, 2024 REBECCA A. WOMELDORF reporter of decisions Page Proof Pending Publication NOTICE: This
jnl24.pdf
(JOURNAL) MONDAY, OCTOBER 7, 2024 1 SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES Present: Chief Justice Roberts, Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, Justice Sotomayor, Justice Kagan, Justice Gorsuch, Justice
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##