No. 15-7250
Title:
Marcelo Manrique, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 4, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-13029)
  Decision Date:July 15, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:September 11, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 2 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 4, 2016)
Dec 30 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 3, 2016.
Jan 19 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 4, 2016.
Mar 4 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Mar 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Apr 18 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016.
Apr 25 2016 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
May 20 2016 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 8, 2016.
May 20 2016 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 1, 2016.
Jul 8 2016 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Jul 8 2016 Brief of petitioner Marcelo Manrique filed.
Jul 13 2016 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 11, 2016.
Jul 22 2016 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Aug 2 2016 Record received from U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Florida is electronic and located on PACER. Also received SEALED pleadings (1 Envelope).
Aug 19 2016 CIRCULATED.
Sep 1 2016 Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Sep 30 2016 Reply of petitioner Marcelo Manrique filed. (Distributed)
Oct 11 2016 Argued. For petitioner: Paul M. Rashkind, Assistant Federal Defender, Miami, Fla. For respondent: Allon Kedem, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Apr 19 2017 Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Breyer, Alito, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor, J., joined. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
May 22 2017 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Paul M. Rashkind Assistant Federal Public Defender(305) 536-6900
    Counsel of Record Chief, Appellate Division
150 West Flagler Street, Suite 1500
Miami, FL  33130-1555
paul_rashkind@fd.org
Party name: Marcelo Manrique
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Allon Kedem Assistant to the Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States