No. 15-214
Title:
Joseph P. Murr, et al., Petitioners
v.
Wisconsin, et al.
Docketed:August 18, 2015
Linked with 15A6
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Wisconsin, District III
  Case Nos.:(2013AP2828)
  Decision Date:December 23, 2014
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:April 16, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 26 2015 Application (15A6) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 15, 2015 to August 14, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 30 2015 Application (15A6) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 14, 2015.
Aug 14 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2015)
Sep 4 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin to respond filed.
Sep 9 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 16, 2015, for all respondents.
Sep 17 2015 Brief amici curiae of California Cattlemen's Association, et al. filed.
Oct 16 2015 Brief of respondent St. Croix County, Wisconsin in opposition filed.
Oct 29 2015 Reply of petitioners Joseph P. Murr, et al. filed.
Nov 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015.
Nov 30 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2015.
Dec 7 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 11, 2015.
Dec 28 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 15 2016 Petition GRANTED.
Feb 9 2016 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including April 11, 2016.
Feb 9 2016 The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including June 10, 2016.
Mar 21 2016 Consent to the filing of timely amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for respondent St. Croix County.
Mar 22 2016 Consent to the filing of timely amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for respondent Wisconsin.
Apr 6 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Apr 11 2016 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Apr 11 2016 Brief of petitioners Joseph P. Murr, et al. filed.
Apr 15 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Realtors Association filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, and the Beacon Center filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amici curiae of California Cattlemen's Association, et al. filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Reason Foundation filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, and Owners' Counsel of America filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Apr 18 2016 Brief amici curiae of Nevada, et al. filed.
Jun 10 2016 Brief of respondent Wisconsin filed.
Jun 10 2016 Brief of respondent St. Croix County filed.
Jun 14 2016 Brief amici curiae of Property Law Professors filed.
Jun 14 2016 Application (15A1265) to extend the time to file a reply brief from July 11, 2016 to July 29, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 16 2016 Brief amici curiae of Carlisle Ford Runge, et al. filed.
Jun 16 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Planning Association, and Wisconsin Chapter of the American Planning Association filed.
Jun 16 2016 Motion for divided argument filed by respondent St. Croix County.
Jun 16 2016 Motion for divided argument filed by respondent Wisconsin.
Jun 17 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Jun 17 2016 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 17 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Trust for Historic Preservation filed.
Jun 17 2016 Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed.
Jun 17 2016 Brief amici curiae of Walter F. Mondale, et al.
Jun 17 2016 Brief amici curiae of The Wisconsin Counties Association, et al. filed.
Jun 17 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, and for divided argument filed.
Jun 20 2016 Application (15A1265) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file petitioners' reply brief on the merits until July 29, 2016.
Jul 27 2016 Reply of petitioners Joseph P. Murr, et al. filed.
Oct 3 2016 Motion for divided argument filed by respondent St. Croix County GRANTED.
Oct 3 2016 Motion for divided argument filed by respondent Wisconsin GRANTED.
Oct 3 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. and the time is divided as follows: 35 minutes for petitioners, 15 minutes for respondent Wisconsin, 10 minutes for respondent St. Croix County, and 10 minutes for the Solicitor General.
Jan 20 2017 Motion of Nevada, et al. out of time for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Feb 3 2017 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 20, 2017
Feb 3 2017 Record requested from the Court of Appeals of Wisconsin, District III.
Feb 9 2017 CIRCULATED.
Feb 21 2017 Motion of Nevada, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Feb 22 2017 Record received from the St. Croix County Circuit Court, Wisconsin (1 box).
Mar 20 2017 Argued. For petitioners: John M. Groen, Sacramento, Cal. For respondent Wisconsin: Misha Tseytlin, Solicitor General, Madison, Wisconsin. For respondent St. Croix County: Richard J. Lazarus, Cambridge, Mass. For United States, as amicus curiae, in support of respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Apr 14 2017 Record received from the Court of Appeals of Wisconsin, District III. The record is electronic.
Jun 23 2017 Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of this case.
Jul 25 2017 MANDATE ISSUED.
Jul 25 2017 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
John Maurice Groen Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
jmg@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Joseph P. Murr, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Richard Lazarus 1545 Massachusetts Ave.(617) 495-8015
    Counsel of RecordAreeda Hall 329
Cambridge, MA  02138
lazarus@law.harvard.edu
Party name: St. Croix County
 
Misha Tseytlin Solicitor General of Wisconsin(608) 267-9323
    Counsel of Record 17 West Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI  53703
tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
Party name: Wisconsin
 
Remzy D. Bitar Arenz, Molter, Macy, Riffle & Larson, S.C.(262) 548-1340
720 N. East Avenue
P.O. Box 1348
Waukesha, WA  53186
rbitar@ammr.net
Party name: St. Croix County, Wisconsin
 
 
Other:
Hope M. Babcock Institute for Public Representation(202) 662-9535
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC  20001
babcock@law.georgetown.edu
Party name: Walter F. Mondale, et al.
 
Stuart Banner UCLA School of Law(310) 206-8506
Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Avenue
Los Angeles, CA  90095
banner@law.ucla.edu
Party name: National Association of Counties, et al.
 
David T. Dana II. Northwestern Pritzker School of Law(312) 503-0240
375 East Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL  60611
d-dana@law.northwestern.edu
Party name: Property Law Professors
 
Steven J. Eagle 3301 Fairfax Drive (703) 993-8054
Arlington, VA  22182
seagle@gmu.edu
Party name: Reason Foundation
 
John C. Eastman Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(714) 628-2666
c/o Chapman University School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92866
jeastman@chapman.edu
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
 
John D. Echeverria Vermont Law School(802) 831-1386
164 Chelsea Street, P.O. Box 96
South Royalton, VT  05068
JEcheverria@vermontlaw.edu
Party name: Carlisle Ford Runge, et al.
 
Kevin Murray Fong Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP (415) 983-1000
Four Embarcadero Center, 22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA  94111
kevin.fong@pillsburylaw.com
Party name: California Cattlemen's Association, et al.
 
Joshua A. Klein Deputy Solicitor General415-703-2543
CA Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA  94102-7004
joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California, et al.
 
Thomas David Larson 4801 Forest Run Road6082412047
Suite 201
Madison, WI  53704
tlarson@wra.org
Party name: Wisconsin Realtors Association
 
Steven J. Lechner Mountain States Legal Foundation(303) 292-2021
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO  80227
lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
 
Jeffrey A. Mandell Stafford Rosenbaum LLP(202)-879-7628
222 West Washington Ave.
Suite 900
Madison, WI  53703
jmandell@staffordlaw
Party name: The Wisconsin Counties Association, et al.
 
Ryan C. Morris Sidley Austin, LLP(202) 736-8000
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
rmorris@sidley.com
Party name: National Trust for Historic Preservation
 
John Pagliaro New England Legal Foundation(617)-695-3660
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA  02111
johnpagliaro@nelfonline.org
Party name: New England Legal DFoundation
 
John J. Park Jr. Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP(678) 347-2208
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA  30309
jjp@sbllaw.net
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, and the Beacon Center
 
Michael H. Park Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC(212) 247-8006
Three Columbus Circle, 15th Floor
New York, NY  10019
park@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: Cato Institute, and Owners' Counsel of America
 
Elizabeth Barchas Prelogar Assistant to the Solicitor General(202) 514-2201
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530
Party name: United States
 
Felix Shafir Horvitz & Levy LLP(818) 995-0800
Business Arts Plaza
3601 West Olive Ave.- 8th Floor
8th FL
Burbank, CA  91505-4681
fshafir@horvitzlevy.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
 
Jerry Stouck Greenberg Traurig, LLP(202) 331-3173
2101 L Street, N.W., Suite 1000
Washington, DC  20037
stouckj@gtlaw.com
Party name: National Association of Home Builders, et al.
 
Nancy E. Stroud Lewis Stroud & Deutsch(561) 826-2800
1900 Glades Road, Suite 251
Boca Raton, FL  33431
nstroud@lsdlaw.net
Party name: American Planning Association, and Wisconsin Chapter of the American Planning Association
 
Lawrence VanDyke Solicitor General(775) 684-1100
Office of the Attorney General
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV  89701
LVanDyke@ag.nv.gov
Party name: Nevada, et al.
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States