No. 15-1262
Title:
Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al., Appellants
v.
David Harris, et al.
Docketed:April 11, 2016
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
  Case Nos.:(1:13-cv-949)
  Decision Date:February 5, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 8 2016 Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due May 11, 2016)
May 11 2016 Motion to affirm filed by appellees David Harris and Christine Bowser
May 24 2016 Reply of appellants Patrick McCrory, Governor of North Carolina, et al. filed.
May 31 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016.
Jun 20 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016.
Jun 27 2016 PROBABLE JURISDICTION NOTED.
Jul 6 2016 Record received from U.S.D.C. Middle District of North Carolina (Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal). The record is electronic.
Aug 3 2016 The time to file the joint appendix and appellants' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 12, 2016.
Sep 12 2016 Brief of appellants Patrick McCrory, Governor of North Carolina, et al. filed.
Sep 12 2016 Joint appendix filed (7 Volumes). (Statement of costs filed.)
Sep 14 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for appellants.
Sep 16 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for appellees.
Sep 16 2016 Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Oct 12 2016 Brief of appellees David Harris and Christine Bowser filed.
Oct 19 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed.
Oct 19 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Oct 19 2016 Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center, et al. filed.
Oct 19 2016 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Oct 19 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law filed.
Oct 19 2016 Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Oct 21 2016 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 5, 2016
Oct 26 2016 CIRCULATED.
Nov 1 2016 Record requested form U.S.D.C. Middle Dist. of North Carolina.
Nov 7 2016 Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 10 2016 Record received from the U.S.D.C. Middle Dist. of North Carolina is electronic.
Nov 14 2016 Reply of appellants Patrick McCrory, Governor of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 5 2016 Argued. For appellants: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For appellees: Mark E. Elias, Washington, D. C.; and Nicole A. Saharsky, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
May 22 2017 Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Ginsburg, Breyer, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment in part and dissenting in part, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, J., joined. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of this case.
Jun 26 2017 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Appellants:
Paul D. Clement Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
 
Thomas A. Farr Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.(919) 787-9700
4208 Six Forks Road., Suite 1100
Raleigh, NC  27609
thomas.farr@ogletreedeakins.com
Party name: Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees:
Marc E. Elias Perkins Coie LLP(202) 654-6200
    Counsel of Record700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC  20005-3960
melias@perkinscoie.com
Party name: David Harris and Christine Bowser
Other:
Debo P. Adegbile Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP(212) 230-8800
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY  10007
deboadegbile@wilmerhale.com
Party name: The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
 
Brianne Jenna Gorod Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
brianne@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
 
John J. Park Jr. Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP(678) 347-2208
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA  30309
jjp@sbllaw.net
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Bradley S. Phillips Munger Tolles & Olson LLP(213) 683-9100
355 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA  90071
Bradley.Phillips@mto.com
Party name: The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
 
Nicole A. Saharsky Assistant to the Solicitor General(202)-514-2201
950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
Party name: United States
 
Paul M. Smith Campaign Legal Center(202) 736-2200
1411 K Street NW
Suite 1400
Washington, DC  20005
psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
Party name: Campaign Legal Center, et al.
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States