Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 17A40
No. 17A40
Title:
Reece N. Tso, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-0497/MC)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 5 2017 Application (17A40) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2017 to September 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 6 2017 Application (17A40) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 29, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Donald R. Ostrom CDR, JAGC, U.S. Navy
    Counsel of Record U.S. Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Division
1254 Charles Morris St., SE
Bldg. 58, Suite 100
Washington Navy Yard, DC  20374
Party name: Reece N. Tso
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States
July 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2