Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16A969
No. 16A969
Title:
Shaquille Montel Robinson, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:April 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-4902)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 7 2017 Application (16A969) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2017 to June 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 18 2017 Application (16A969) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 22, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jeffrey L. Fisher Stanford Law School(650) 724-7081
    Counsel of RecordSupreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305-8610
Party name: Shaquille Montel Robinson
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543