Docket for 16A64
No. 16A64 | |
Title: |
Vincent Forras, et al., Applicants |
v. |
Imam Feisal Abdul Rauf, et al. |
|
Docketed: | July 15, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 13 2016 |
Application (16A64) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 18, 2016 to September 1, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jul 15 2016 |
Application (16A64) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 28, 2016. |
|