Docket for 16A365
No. 16A365 | |
Title: |
Oil States Energy Services, LLC, Applicant |
v. |
Greene's Energy Group, LLC |
|
Docketed: | October 13, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 13 2016 |
Application (16A365) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2016 to November 23, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Oct 14 2016 |
Application (16A365) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 23, 2016. |
|