Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16A1135
No. 16A1135
Title:
Emmanuel Q. Bartee, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 19, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-0391)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 19 2017 Application (16A1135) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2017 to July 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 19 2017 Application (16A1135) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 28, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
R. Andrew Austria U.S. Navy-Marine Corps202-685-7054
    Counsel of RecordAppellate Defense Division
1254 Charles Morris St., SE
Bldg. 58, Suite 100
Washington Navy Yard, DC  20374
Party name: Emmanuel Q. Bartee
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States
July 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2