Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-970
No. 16-970
Title:
Brandon Lance Rinehart, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:February 6, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
  Case Nos.:(S222620)
  Decision Date:August 22, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 2 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2017)
Feb 13 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Feb 23 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 7, 2017.
Feb 24 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amici curiae of Western Mining Alliance, et al. filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of American Exploration & Mining Association filed.
Apr 7 2017 Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Apr 19 2017 Reply of petitioner Brandon Lance Rinehart filed.
Apr 25 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jonathan Calvin Wood Pacific Legal Foundation(202) 888-6881
    Counsel of Record 3033 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA  22201
jw@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Brandon Lance Rinehart
Attorneys for Respondent:
Joshua A. Klein Deputy Solicitor General415-703-2543
    Counsel of Record CA Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA  94102-7004
joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California
Other:
Paul J. Beard II. Alston & Bird LLP(916) 498-3354
1115 11th Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
paul.beard@alston.com
Party name: Western Mining Alliance, et al.
 
Kimberly S. Hermann Southeastern Legal Foundation770-977-2131
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA  30062
khermann@southeasternlegal.org
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
 
Steven J. Lechner Mountain States Legal Foundation(303) 292-2021
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO  80227
lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
Party name: American Exploration & Mining Association
May 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2