Docket for 16-8813
No. 16-8813 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
George Williams, Jr., Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | April 24, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S131819) |
Decision Date: | December 5, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 18, 2017 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 14 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 24, 2017) |
May 23 2017 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Jun 1 2017 |
Reply of petitioner George Williams, Jr. filed. |
Jun 7 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. |
Jun 26 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|