~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 20 2016 |
Application (16A402) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2016 to January 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Oct 25 2016 |
Application (16A402) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 28, 2016. |
Dec 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2017) |
Jan 13 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 6, 2017. |
Feb 2 2017 |
Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc. filed. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Brief of respondent Theodore Washington in opposition filed. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Theodore Washington. |
Mar 13 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections filed. |
Mar 15 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017. |
Mar 29 2017 |
Rescheduled. |
Apr 10 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017. |
Apr 17 2017 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
Apr 17 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |