Docket for 16-8357
No. 16-8357 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Michael Ray Burgener, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | March 15, 2017 |
Linked with 16A637 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S179181) |
Decision Date: | August 11, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 12, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 27 2016 |
Application (16A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2017 to March 11, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 30 2016 |
Application (16A637) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until March 11, 2017. |
Mar 9 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 14, 2017) |
Apr 13 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2017. |
May 15 2017 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
May 31 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|