Docket for 16-8318
No. 16-8318 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Roy L. Ward, Petitioner |
v. |
Ron Neal, Superintendent, Indiana State Prison |
|
Docketed: | March 14, 2017 |
Linked with 16A628 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (16-1001) |
Decision Date: | August 26, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 11, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 20 2016 |
Application (16A628) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2017 to March 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Dec 28 2016 |
Application (16A628) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2017. |
Mar 10 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 13, 2017) |
Apr 13 2017 |
Brief of respondent Ron Neal, Superintendent, Indiana State Prison in opposition filed. |
Apr 21 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Roy L. Ward filed. |
May 3 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017. |
May 22 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|