Docket for 16-8125
No. 16-8125 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Gerald Cornelius Eldridge, Petitioner |
v. |
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | February 28, 2017 |
Linked with 16A593 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70023) |
Decision Date: | August 29, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 20, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 14 2016 |
Application (16A593) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2017 to February 27, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 21 2016 |
Application (16A593) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 27, 2017. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 30, 2017) |
Mar 30 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 1, 2017. |
Apr 28 2017 |
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
May 16 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Gerald Cornelius Eldridge filed. |
May 17 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017. |
Jun 5 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|