Docket for 16-7988
No. 16-7988 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Scott Mansfield, Petitioner |
v. |
Florida |
|
Docketed: | February 17, 2017 |
Linked with 16A780 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Nos.: | (SC15-411) |
Decision Date: | August 25, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 14, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 23 2017 |
Application (16A780) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2017 to April 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Feb 13 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 20, 2017) |
Feb 15 2017 |
Application (16A780) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 13, 2017. |
Mar 20 2017 |
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
Mar 31 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Scott Mansfield filed. |
Apr 6 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017. |
Apr 24 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|