Docket for 16-7984
No. 16-7984 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Grady Brinkley, Petitioner |
v. |
Ed Sheldon, Warden |
|
Docketed: | February 16, 2017 |
Linked with 16A550 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-3011) |
Decision Date: | July 25, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 16, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 2 2016 |
Application (16A550) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 15, 2016 to February 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Dec 6 2016 |
Application (16A550) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 13, 2017. |
Feb 13 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 20, 2017) |
Mar 20 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 19, 2017. |
Apr 12 2017 |
Brief of respondent Ed Sheldon, Warden in opposition filed. |
Apr 26 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017. |
May 15 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|