Docket for 16-7932
No. 16-7932 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Bobby A. Raleigh, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | February 14, 2017 |
Linked with 16A574 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-14198-P) |
Decision Date: | June 30, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 13, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 7 2016 |
Application (16A574) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 12, 2016 to February 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 13 2016 |
Application (16A574) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 10, 2017. |
Feb 10 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 16, 2017) |
Mar 1 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 17, 2017. |
Apr 17 2017 |
Brief of respondents Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
May 3 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017. |
May 22 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|