Docket for 16-7918
No. 16-7918 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Charles Ray Crawford, Petitioner |
v. |
Mississippi |
|
Docketed: | February 13, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Mississippi |
Case Nos.: | (2013-DR-02147-SCT) |
Decision Date: | August 4, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 10, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 8 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 15, 2017) |
Mar 16 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 14, 2017. |
Apr 13 2017 |
Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed. |
Apr 28 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Charles Ray Crawford filed. |
May 3 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017. |
May 22 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|