Docket for 16-7874
No. 16-7874 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Ivan Abner Cantu, Petitioner |
v. |
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | February 9, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (16-70016) |
Decision Date: | November 7, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 6 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 13, 2017) |
Mar 10 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 12, 2017. |
Apr 27 2017 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 12, 2017. |
May 12 2017 |
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
May 31 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|