Docket for 16-7856
No. 16-7856 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Caron Montgomery, Petitioner |
v. |
Ohio |
|
Docketed: | February 8, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Ohio |
Case Nos.: | (2012-1212) |
Decision Date: | August 24, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 9, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 6 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 10, 2017) |
Mar 15 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 7, 2017. |
Mar 24 2017 |
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed. |
Apr 13 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. |
May 1 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|