Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-780
No. 16-780
Title:
Ekaterina Schoenefeld, Petitioner
v.
Eric T. Schneiderman, Attorney General of New York, et al.
Docketed:December 20, 2016
Linked with 16A376
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-4283-cv)
  Decision Date:April 22, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:July 28, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 12 2016 Application (16A376) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 26, 2016 to December 16, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Oct 17 2016 Application (16A376) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 16, 2016.
Dec 16 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2017)
Jan 17 2017 Waiver of right of respondents Eric T. Schneiderman, Attorney General of New York, et al. to respond filed.
Jan 18 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Association of Corporate Counsel filed.
Jan 19 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Association of Professional Responsibility Lawyers filed.
Jan 19 2017 Brief amicus curiae of New Jersey State Bar Association filed.
Feb 1 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 8 2017 Response Requested . (Due March 10, 2017)
Mar 10 2017 Brief of respondents Eric T. Schneiderman, Attorney General of New York, et al. in opposition filed.
Mar 22 2017 Reply of petitioner Ekaterina Schoenfeld filed.
Mar 28 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Ekaterina Schoenefeld 32 Chambers Street
Suite 2
Princeton, NY  08542
Party name: Ekaterina Schoenfeld
Attorneys for Respondents:
Barbara D. Underwood Solicitor General(518) 776-2040
    Counsel of Record NY State Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol
Albany, NY  12224
barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
Party name: Eric T. Schneiderman, Attorney General of New York, et al.
 
Other:
Joel D. Bertocchi Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP(312) 704-3000
222 North LaSalle Street
Suite 300
Chicago, IL  60601-1081
jbertocchi@hinshawlaw.com
Party name: The Association of Professional Responsibility Lawyers
 
Lawrence S. Ebner Capital Appellate Advocacy, PLLC(202) 729-6337
1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20006
lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
Party name: The Association of Corporate Counsel
 
David B. Rubin David B. Rubin, P.C.(732) 767-0440
44 Bridge Street, P.O. Box 4579
Metuchen, NJ  08840
rubinlaw@att.net
Party name: New Jersey State Bar Association
April 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2