Docket for 16-7685
No. 16-7685 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Taurus Jermaine Carroll, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | January 25, 2017 |
Linked with 16A473 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-12-0599) |
Decision Date: | August 14, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 27, 2016 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | August 26, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 7 2016 |
Application (16A473) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 24, 2016 to January 23, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Nov 10 2016 |
Application (16A473) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 23, 2017. |
Jan 23 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 24, 2017) |
Feb 17 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 27, 2017. |
Mar 27 2017 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
Apr 7 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Taurus Jermaine Carroll filed. |
Apr 13 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. |
May 1 2017 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Moore v. Texas, 581 U. S. ____ (2017). |
Jun 2 2017 |
MANDATE ISSUED |
Jun 2 2017 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|