Docket for 16-7533
No. 16-7533 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Edgardo Sanchez, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | January 12, 2017 |
Linked with 16A458 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S045423) |
Decision Date: | June 23, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 2 2016 |
Application (16A458) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 15, 2016, to January 14, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Nov 7 2016 |
Application (16A458) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 14, 2017. |
Jan 10 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 13, 2017) |
Feb 13 2017 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Feb 24 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Edgaro Sanchez filed. |
Mar 2 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017. |
Mar 20 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|