Docket for 16-7454
No. 16-7454 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Roberto Moreno Ramos, Petitioner |
v. |
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | January 6, 2017 |
Linked with 16A404 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-70044) |
Decision Date: | June 30, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 4, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 20 2016 |
Application (16A404) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 2, 2016 to January 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Oct 26 2016 |
Application (16A404) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 1, 2017. |
Jan 3 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 6, 2017) |
Jan 31 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 8, 2017. |
Mar 2 2017 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 7, 2017. |
Apr 7 2017 |
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Apr 19 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Roberto Moreno Ramos filed. |
Apr 26 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017. |
May 15 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|