Docket for 16-7425
No. 16-7425 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jack Gordon Greene, Petitioner |
v. |
Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction |
|
Docketed: | January 5, 2017 |
Linked with 16A498 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (16-1456) |
Decision Date: | June 3, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 31, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 15 2016 |
Application (16A498) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 29, 2016 to January 27, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Nov 17 2016 |
Application (16A498) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 29, 2016. |
Dec 29 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 6, 2017) |
Jan 13 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 13, 2017. |
Mar 3 2017 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 27, 2017. |
Mar 27 2017 |
Brief of respondent Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction in opposition filed. |
Apr 6 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Jack Gordon Greene filed. |
Apr 13 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. |
May 1 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|