Docket for 16-7419
No. 16-7419 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Aaron Brian Gunches, Petitioner |
v. |
Arizona |
|
Docketed: | January 5, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Arizona |
Case Nos.: | (CR-13-0282-AP) |
Decision Date: | September 1, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 29 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 6, 2017) |
Jan 30 2017 |
Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed. |
Feb 10 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Aaron Brian Gunches filed. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|