Docket for 16-7413
No. 16-7413 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
William Clinton Clark, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | January 4, 2017 |
Linked with 16A414 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S066940) |
Decision Date: | June 27, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 10, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 20 2016 |
Application (16A414) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 8, 2016 to January 7, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Oct 27 2016 |
Application (16A414) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 7, 2017. |
Dec 30 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 3, 2017) |
Feb 1 2017 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|