Docket for 16-741
No. 16-741 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Mikal D. Mahdi, Petitioner |
v. |
South Carolina |
|
Docketed: | December 7, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Common Pleas of South Carolina, Calhoun County |
Case Nos.: | (09-CP-09-164) |
Decision Date: | August 18, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | September 8, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 7 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2017) |
Jan 6 2017 |
Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed. |
Jan 23 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Mikal D. Mahdi filed. |
Jan 25 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|