Docket for 16-7335
No. 16-7335 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Juan Balderas, Petitioner |
v. |
Texas |
|
Docketed: | December 28, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (AP-77,036) |
Decision Date: | November 2, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 27, 2017) |
Jan 26 2017 |
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Feb 9 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|