Docket for 16-7215
No. 16-7215 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Robert Keith Ray, Petitioner |
v. |
Colorado |
|
Docketed: | December 15, 2016 |
Linked with 16A504 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Colorado |
Case Nos.: | (12CA0263) |
Decision Date: | July 16, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 15, 2016 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | August 22, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 16 2016 |
Application (16A504) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 20, 2016 to January 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Nov 18 2016 |
Application (16A504) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 12, 2016. |
Dec 12 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 17, 2017) |
Jan 5 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 20, 2017. |
Mar 20 2017 |
Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed. |
Apr 3 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Robert Keith Ray filed. |
Apr 6 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017. |
Apr 24 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|